Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rustand, Jeffrey, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Grant County, MN, . Grant County, MN Superior Courts with Doll, Amy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2017 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrant County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeLetters Issued - Unsupervised Formal |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 20, 2018Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib
Date: July 20, 2018Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 26, 2018Order and Notice of Hearing
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 29, 2018Inventory
Date: May 29, 2018Order and Notice of Hearing
Date: May 29, 2018Proposed Order or Document
Date: May 24, 2018Final Accounting
Date: May 24, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 24, 2018Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 27, 2017Petition for Ord of Comp Settle of Estate-Decree of Distrib
Date: May 24, 2018Written Statement of Claim
Date: June 06, 2017Copy Request
Date: June 05, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: April 17, 2017Letters Testamentary
Date: April 17, 2017Order for Frml Probate of Will-Appointment of Pers Rep-Unsup
Date: April 17, 2017Affidavit of Publication
Date: April 06, 2017Proposed Order or Document
Date: March 21, 2017Notice of Case Filing
Date: March 21, 2017Will
Date: March 21, 2017Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 21, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: March 21, 2017Notice to Creditors
Date: March 21, 2017Proposed Order or Document
Date: March 16, 2017Acceptance of Appointment and Oath
Date: March 16, 2017Petition for Formal Probate of Will-Appt PR Rep-Unsupervised
Date: March 16, 2017Satisfaction of Claim and Withdrawal of Demand for Notice
Date: June 27, 2017Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 06, 2017Petition for Ord of Comp Settle of Estate-Decree of Distrib Index #22
Date: May 24, 2018Final Accounting Index #23
Date: May 24, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #24
Date: May 24, 2018Inventory Index #25
Date: May 29, 2018Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #28
Date: June 25, 2018Affidavit of Mailing Index #29
Date: June 26, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Index #31
Date: July 20, 2018Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #26
Date: May 29, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Index #27
Date: May 29, 2018Petition for Formal Probate of Will-Appt PR Rep-Unsupervised Index #1
Date: March 16, 2017Notice of Case Filing Filed By: Attorney ANDERSON, JUSTIN ROBERT Index #6
Date: March 21, 2017Notice to Creditors Filed By: Attorney ANDERSON, JUSTIN ROBERT Index #5
Date: March 21, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #3
Date: March 16, 2017Written Statement of Claim Index #18
Date: June 06, 2017Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #2
Date: March 16, 2017Affidavit of Mailing Index #20
Date: June 27, 2017Notice of Hearing Index #21
Date: May 24, 2018Satisfaction of Claim and Withdrawal of Demand for Notice Index #19
Date: June 27, 2017Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib Index #30
Date: July 20, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney ANDERSON, JUSTIN ROBERT Index #15
Date: April 17, 2017Affidavit of Mailing Index #17
Date: June 06, 2017Letters Testamentary Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #14
Date: April 17, 2017Affidavit of Publication Index #12
Date: April 06, 2017Copy Request Index #16
Date: June 05, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #11
Date: March 21, 2017Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney ANDERSON, JUSTIN ROBERT Index #4
Date: March 21, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #8
Date: March 21, 2017Will Index #7
Date: March 21, 2017Affidavit of Mailing Index #10
Date: March 21, 2017Affidavit of Mailing Index #9
Date: March 21, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #31 | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib Index #30 | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #29 | |
June 25, 2018 | Hearing |
Order and Notice of Hearing
Judge: Doll, Amy J. |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #28 | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Inventory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.