Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dean, Bobbie Jo, Dean, Brian, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Eggers, Norbert D., in the jurisdiction of Grant County, MN, . Grant County, MN Superior Courts with Doll, Amy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2016 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGrant County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Proposed Order or Document Index #156
Date: August 16, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #160
Date: September 20, 2023Order Directing Mortgage or Sale Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #161
Date: September 25, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #138
Date: March 18, 2022Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Guardian Dean, Bobbie Jo Index #129
Date: June 15, 2021Order Allowing Final Account Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #112
Date: July 27, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #158
Date: August 17, 2023Personal Well-Being Report Filed By: Guardian Dean, Bobbie Jo Index #126
Date: June 03, 2021Affidavit of Service Index #109
Date: June 15, 2020Notice of Deficiency Index #120
Date: April 05, 2021Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #80
Date: November 08, 2018Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #110
Date: June 19, 2020Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #85
Date: December 03, 2018Copy Request Index #79
Date: September 18, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #90
Date: March 18, 2019Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #92
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #88
Date: February 14, 2019Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #84
Date: December 03, 2018Notice of Hearing Index #106
Date: June 15, 2020Affidavit of Service Index #105
Date: June 09, 2020Proposed Order or Document Index #34
Date: March 20, 2017Waiver of Appearance Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #45
Date: January 31, 2018Affidavit of Mailing Index #159
Date: August 22, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #151
Date: April 07, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #89
Date: February 22, 2019Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #78
Date: September 17, 2018Affidavit of Service Index #96
Date: May 20, 2019Proposed Order or Document Index #62
Date: July 16, 2018Petition-Other Index #61
Date: July 16, 2018Notice of Hearing Index #68
Date: July 26, 2018Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #73
Date: September 10, 2018Affidavit of Service Index #66
Date: July 17, 2018Affidavit of Service Index #69
Date: July 31, 2018Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #67
Date: July 26, 2018Correspondence Index #71
Date: September 06, 2018Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #64
Date: July 17, 2018Order Granting Guardianship - Conservatorship Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #76
Date: September 13, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #70
Date: September 06, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #60
Date: July 16, 2018Notice of Hearing Index #27
Date: February 20, 2017Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney MARSHALL, KENT D; Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #26
Date: February 08, 2017Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #21
Date: January 31, 2017Request for Telephone Appearance Index #30
Date: March 09, 2017Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney MARSHALL, KENT D; Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #25
Date: February 08, 2017Notice of Entry of Order Right to Appeal-Ward or Prot Person Index #39
Date: March 30, 2017Affidavit of Service Index #13
Date: November 28, 2016Affidavit of Service Index #28
Date: February 20, 2017Petition for Guardianship - Conservatorship Index #1
Date: November 23, 2016Other Document Index #31
Date: March 10, 2017Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #20
Date: January 31, 2017Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #23
Date: February 06, 2017Order Appointing Attorney Index #12
Date: November 23, 2016Proposed Order or Document Index #17
Date: January 31, 2017Affidavit-Other Index #19
Date: January 31, 2017Order for Emergency Guardianship - Conservatorship Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #11
Date: November 23, 2016Order Appointing Visitor Index #24
Date: February 06, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #3
Date: November 23, 2016Proposed Order or Document Index #22
Date: January 31, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #75
Date: September 11, 2018Order for Payment Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #49
Date: February 02, 2018Affidavit of Service Index #57
Date: April 06, 2018Notice to New Conservators Index #40
Date: March 31, 2017Petition-Other Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #47
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #65
Date: July 17, 2018Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #9
Date: November 23, 2016Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #7
Date: November 23, 2016Proposed Order or Document Index #6
Date: November 23, 2016Proposed Order or Document Index #5
Date: November 23, 2016Proposed Order or Document Index #8
Date: November 23, 2016Proposed Order or Document Index #46
Date: January 31, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #48
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #50
Date: February 02, 2018Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #33
Date: March 20, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #35
Date: March 20, 2017Petition-Other Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #44
Date: January 31, 2018Petition for Guardianship - Conservatorship Index #18
Date: January 31, 2017Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #4
Date: November 23, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CARP Account Summary Filed By: Successor Conservator Caron, Sandra L.; Successor Guardian Caron, Sandra L.; Name Not Available Online Index #164 | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Filed By: Successor Conservator Caron, Sandra L.; Successor Guardian Caron, Sandra L.; Name Not Available Online Index #163 | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Successor Conservator Caron, Sandra L.; Successor Guardian Caron, Sandra L.; Name Not Available Online; Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #162 | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Directing Mortgage or Sale Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #161 | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #160 | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #159 | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed By: Successor Conservator Caron, Sandra L.; Successor Guardian Caron, Sandra L.; Name Not Available Online; Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #157 | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney VELDE, BRENDA Index #158 | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #156 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.