Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Grant County, MN, . Grant County, MN Superior Courts with Doll, Amy J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2018 |
CategoryCustody |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGrant County, MN |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: August 30, 2022Judgment
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 06, 2022Appendix A to Family Court Order
Date: July 06, 2022Order for Temporary Relief
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: July 06, 2022Order for Child Support
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: February 03, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: October 01, 2020Order for Continuance
Date: October 09, 2020Judgment
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Deficiency
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Judicial Determination
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 31, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: September 09, 2020Order for Hearing
Date: August 26, 2020Findings and Order
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Judicial Determination
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: August 10, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Filing of Order
Date: June 22, 2020Order for Child Support
Date: June 19, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 27, 2020Pandemic Notice of Cancelled or Rescheduled Hearing
Date: April 16, 2020Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 07, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Judicial Determination
Date: January 13, 2020Order for Hearing
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Judicial Determination
Date: August 14, 2020Notice of registration under UIFSA
Date: December 23, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: December 16, 2019Order for Temporary Relief
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Judicial Determination
Date: August 14, 2019Order-Other
Date: June 24, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 01, 2019Order-Other
Date: June 30, 2019Notice-Other
Date: March 07, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: June 28, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: October 05, 2018Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 16, 2018Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: August 15, 2018Order for Initial Case Management Conference
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: July 26, 2018Certified Copy of Foreign Decree
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 07, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Appendix A to Family Court Order | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
July 06, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.