Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Order Appointing Attorney Index # 17 filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Freeborn County, MN, . Freeborn County, MN Superior Courts with Ross L. Leuning presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2023 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFreeborn County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 21 | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Visitor's Report Index # 20 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 19 | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 18 | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Index # 17 (Judicial Officer: Leuning, Ross L. )
Judge: Leuning, Ross L. |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Visitor Index # 16 (Judicial Officer: Leuning, Ross L. )
Judge: Leuning, Ross L. |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 15 | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Priority Task Manager Review [R] Index # 14 | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.