Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Michael Hastings, filed a(n) Probate case in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior Court of Napa - Probate and Mental Health.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 06, 2004 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Napa - Probate and Mental Health |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2006 | Action |
Receipt 522161-Receipt Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk RECEIPT [522161] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
July 19, 2006 | Action |
Proof of Service 512310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk PROOF OF SERVICE [512310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
July 14, 2006 | Action |
Receipt 522161-Receipt Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk RECEIPT [522161] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
July 12, 2006 | Action |
Notice 512910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE [512910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
June 14, 2006 | Action |
Order 514210-Order Filed/Issued By: 935210 - Attorney for Conservator |
|
June 07, 2006 | Action |
Order 514210-Order Filed/Issued By: 935210 - Attorney for Conservator ORDER [514210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CONSERVATOR [935210] |
|
June 06, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing: Accounting 511140-Hearing: Accounting; Conservatorship of Schleicher, Donna L (G) ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Raymond A. Guadagni |
|
June 06, 2006 | Hearing |
Petition Hearing 511110-Hearing: Petition; Conservatorship of Schleicher, Donna L (G) ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Raymond A. Guadagni |
|
June 06, 2006 | Action |
Minute Order 513610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: |
|
June 02, 2006 | Action |
Declaration 513310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.