Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Correspondence Index # 39 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Freeborn County, MN, . Freeborn County, MN Superior Courts with Schwab, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFreeborn County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 80
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Index # 79
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 78
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 77 (Judicial Officer: Schwab, Steven )
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order Index # 76
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 75
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index # 74 (Judicial Officer: Schwab, Steven )
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 73 (Judicial Officer: Schwab, Steven )
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Index # 72
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion Index # 71
Judge: Schwab, Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.