Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jurgensen, John L, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Moreno, Hugo Torres, in the jurisdiction of Freeborn County, MN, . Freeborn County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFreeborn County, MN |
|
Summons Index #2
Date: September 09, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: September 09, 2022Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: September 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Moreno, Hugo Torres Index #6 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index # 6 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Moreno, Hugo Torres Index #5 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index # 5 | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #2 | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3 | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index #4 | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 3 | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index # 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.