Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wika Oades, Ann, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Wika, Conrad, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, MN, . Cook County, MN Superior Courts with Cuzzo, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCook County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Amended Inventory
Date: August 01, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 14, 2022Notice of Deficiency
Date: July 28, 2022Order Directing Mortgage or Sale
Date: July 13, 2022Appraisal
Date: July 13, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: July 08, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: May 31, 2022Inventory or Account Review Report
Date: August 03, 2022Order Appointing Attorney
Date: May 31, 2022CAAP Audit Report
Date: July 28, 2022Assessor's Market Valuation
Date: May 26, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: July 13, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 31, 2022Affidavit-Other
Date: May 26, 2022Petition-Other
Date: May 26, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: May 26, 2022Inventory
Date: April 20, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 17, 2022Notice to New Conservators
Date: February 17, 2022Appraisal
Date: May 26, 2022Order Granting Guardianship - Conservatorship
Date: February 17, 2022Reminder Notice
Date: April 13, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: February 04, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: February 03, 2022Notice-Other
Date: February 17, 2022Petition for Guardianship - Conservatorship
Date: February 04, 2022Letters of Guardianship - Conservatorship
Date: February 17, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: February 03, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: February 15, 2022Certificate of Representation
Date: February 03, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath
Date: February 03, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 14, 2022Consent to Criminal Background Check
Date: January 25, 2022Notice-Other
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: January 11, 2022Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 07, 2022Amended Letters
Date: January 07, 2022Order Appointing Attorney
Date: January 11, 2022Amended Letters
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Change of Address
Date: January 03, 2022Petition for Guardianship - Conservatorship
Date: January 03, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: January 03, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: December 13, 2021Order Approving Attorney Fees
Date: December 10, 2021Proposed Order or Document
Date: December 09, 2021Letters of Emergency Guardianship - Conservatorship
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: November 12, 2021Order for Emergency Guardianship - Conservatorship
Date: November 12, 2021Order-Other
Date: January 07, 2022Power of Attorney
Date: November 12, 2021Affidavit of Service
Date: November 12, 2021Order Appointing Visitor
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: November 09, 2021Affidavit of Service
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 11, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: November 05, 2021Notice-Other
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 05, 2021Order Appointing Attorney
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Case Filing
Date: November 05, 2021Proposed Order or Document
Date: November 09, 2021Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: November 05, 2021Petition for Emergency Guardianship - Conservatorship
Date: November 05, 2021Notice to New Conservators Index #57
Date: February 17, 2022Petition-Other Index #60
Date: May 26, 2022Affidavit-Other Index #61
Date: May 26, 2022Reminder Notice Filed By: Attorney SIPILA, ANGELA ERICKSON Index #58
Date: April 13, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #51
Date: February 15, 2022Order Granting Guardianship - Conservatorship Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #53
Date: February 17, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #50
Date: February 04, 2022Order Allowing Annual Account Judicial Officer: Starr, Mark M. Index #89
Date: October 18, 2023Petition for Guardianship - Conservatorship Index #49
Date: February 04, 2022Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #41
Date: January 14, 2022Power of Attorney Index #19
Date: November 12, 2021Affidavit of Service Index #48
Date: February 03, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #47
Date: February 03, 2022Consent to Criminal Background Check Index #43
Date: January 25, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #46
Date: February 03, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #44
Date: February 03, 2022Power of Attorney Index #18
Date: November 12, 2021Annual Notice of Rights Index #82
Date: April 04, 2023Order Directing Mortgage or Sale Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #73
Date: July 13, 2022Order Appointing Attorney Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #34
Date: January 11, 2022Notice-Other Index #11
Date: November 05, 2021Order Appointing Visitor Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #36
Date: January 11, 2022Amended Letters Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #30
Date: January 06, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #15
Date: November 09, 2021Amended Letters Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #32
Date: January 07, 2022Order-Other Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #31
Date: January 07, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #14
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Hearing Index #9
Date: November 05, 2021Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #5
Date: November 05, 2021Order Appointing Attorney Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #7
Date: November 05, 2021Order Appointing Attorney Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #66
Date: May 31, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #70
Date: July 08, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #72
Date: July 13, 2022Appraisal Index #71
Date: July 13, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #65
Date: May 26, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #64
Date: May 26, 2022Assessor's Market Valuation Index #63
Date: May 26, 2022Appraisal Index #62
Date: May 26, 2022Order Approving Attorney Fees Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #24
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney HUGHES, FRANCIS XAVIER Index #25
Date: December 13, 2021Order for Emergency Guardianship - Conservatorship Judicial Officer: Harris, Dale O. Index #20
Date: November 12, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #23
Date: December 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney SIPILA, ANGELA ERICKSON; Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Petitioner Wika Oades, Ann Index #90 | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Allowing Annual Account Judicial Officer: Starr, Mark M. Index #89 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Filed By: Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Petitioner Wika Oades, Ann Index #88 | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney SIPILA, ANGELA ERICKSON; Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Petitioner Wika Oades, Ann Index #85 | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney SIPILA, ANGELA ERICKSON; Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Petitioner Wika Oades, Ann Index #86 | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Filed By: Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Petitioner Wika Oades, Ann Index #87 | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CAAP Audit Report Filed By: Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Petitioner Wika Oades, Ann Index #84 | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Annual or Periodic Accounting Filed By: Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Conservator Wika Oades, Ann; Emergency Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Guardian Wika Oades, Ann; Petitioner Wika Oades, Ann Index #83 | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Annual Notice of Rights Index #82 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.