Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Certificate Of Dissolution Index # 37 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Cook County, MN, . Cook County, MN Superior Courts with Cuzzo, Michael J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeChange Of Name Granted |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: November 06, 2017Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Date: November 06, 2017Certificate of Dissolution
Date: October 10, 2017Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: October 11, 2017Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: October 10, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 28, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: September 26, 2017Order-Other
Date: August 28, 2017Order-Other
Date: September 26, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: July 26, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 25, 2017ICMC Order for Financial Early Neutral Evaluation
Date: July 25, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: July 10, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: May 04, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 28, 2017Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: February 28, 2017Notice-Other
Date: February 27, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: February 27, 2017Notice of Discrepancy
Date: February 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Judge: Eichenwald, Jill |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 40
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order Index # 39 (Judicial Officer: Eichenwald, Jill )
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Name Change Sent to Secretary of State
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 38
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution Index # 36
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Dissolution
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.