Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jansen, Carrie, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Troe, Jon Shawn Scott - Lead Attorney, against Dahl, Glen, Jansen, Laura Jean, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, MN, . Cook County, MN Superior Courts with Anderson, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCook County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Notice of Appearance Index #10
Date: January 13, 2023Witness List Index #9
Date: January 06, 2023Certify Personal Service Index #15
Date: January 18, 2023Order and Judgment-Eviction Index #11
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #8
Date: December 27, 2022Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: December 09, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: December 09, 2022Order for Trial Index #6
Date: December 27, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7
Date: December 27, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #5
Date: December 16, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #4
Date: December 16, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: December 02, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #16
Date: January 18, 2023Request for Writ of Recovery Index #13
Date: January 16, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Index #14
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #12
Date: January 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index #15 | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #16 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Index #14 | |
January 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Writ of Recovery Index #13 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance Index #10 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Index #11 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #12 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Dahl, Glen; Defendant JANSEN, LAURA JEAN | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.