Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eviction Hearing filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Cook County, MN, . Cook County, MN Superior Courts with Cuzzo, Michael J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2013 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCook County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeEviction, Violation Of Covenants - Judgment |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 07, 2013Order and Judgment-Eviction
Date: May 07, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service by Posting
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Other Document
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction (Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. )
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Eviction, Violation of Covenants - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J.)
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Not Found
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.