Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tharaldson, Joseph D, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Dowdal, Bridgid presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2023 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Request for Waiver of Bond Index #6
Date: January 23, 2023Petition for Frml Adjudication of Intestacy-Determ of Heirs Index #1
Date: January 23, 2023Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #3
Date: January 23, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #2
Date: January 23, 2023Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #8
Date: January 25, 2023Nomination of Personal Representative Index #4
Date: January 23, 2023Request for Waiver of Bond Index #5
Date: January 23, 2023Nomination of Personal Representative Index #7
Date: January 23, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #9
Date: January 25, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #14
Date: February 03, 2023Letters of General Administration Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #18
Date: March 24, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #10
Date: January 25, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #24
Date: August 29, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #13
Date: February 03, 2023Written Statement of Claim Index #17
Date: February 28, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #15
Date: February 03, 2023Affidavit of Publication Index #16
Date: February 13, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #22
Date: August 29, 2023Written Statement of Claim Index #21
Date: August 29, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #20
Date: March 24, 2023Notice of Disallowance or Partial Allowance of Claim Index #23
Date: August 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #24 | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #22 | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Written Statement of Claim Index #21 | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Disallowance or Partial Allowance of Claim Index #23 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Claims Due | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters of General Administration Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #18 | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Frml Adjudication of Intestacy, Determin of Heir Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #19 | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #20 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Watchke-Koranne, James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.