Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Taylor, Brenda L., filed a(n) Decree Of Descent case in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Dowdal, Bridgid presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryDecree Of Descent |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Cover Sheet for Non Public Documents Form 11.2 Index #3
Date: January 17, 2023Certificate of Representation Index #1
Date: January 17, 2023Petition for Determination of Descent Index #2
Date: January 17, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #5
Date: January 17, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #6
Date: January 17, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #12
Date: January 31, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #7
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8
Date: January 20, 2023Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #9
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #10
Date: January 20, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #11
Date: January 24, 2023Medical Assistance Clearance Index #15
Date: February 21, 2023Affidavit of Publication Index #13
Date: February 21, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #18
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #17
Date: March 09, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #14
Date: February 21, 2023Decree of Descent Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #16
Date: March 09, 2023Copy Request Index #19
Date: May 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #19 | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #18 | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #17 | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Decree of Descent Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #16 | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Watchke-Koranne, James | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Watchke-Koranne, James )
Judge: Watchke-Koranne, James |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Medical Assistance Clearance Index #15 | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication Index #13 | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.