Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Default Hearing filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Catherine A. Trevino presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 10
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 9
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. )
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to County Support and Collections Index # 5
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 7
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form 11.1 personal information Index # 4
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet for Non Public Documents Form 11.2 Index # 6
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 3 (Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. )
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 2
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.