Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Witte, Dylan Bryant, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Larson-Taylor, Haley Mae, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Trevino, Catherine A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryCustody |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Notice of Filing of Order Index #14
Date: March 21, 2023Order for Custody Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #23
Date: May 04, 2023Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #17
Date: April 06, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #24
Date: May 04, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #10
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #12
Date: March 21, 2023Six-Month Review Hearing Request Instructions Index #25
Date: May 04, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #18
Date: April 06, 2023Notice of Deficiency Index #7
Date: January 30, 2023Notice of Initial Case Management Conference Index #9
Date: February 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Custody Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #23 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #24 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Six-Month Review Hearing Request Instructions Index #25 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #22 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation Index #21 | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Social Early Neutral Evaluation - Full Settlement | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ENE Memorandum of Custody and Parenting Time Agreement Index #20 | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Social Early Neutral Evaluation Provider's Report Index #19 | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.