Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fairview Health Services, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Sandy, Christina Rae - Lead Attorney, against Dufeck, Christopher S, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2023 |
CategoryTranscript Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #5
Date: April 26, 2023Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Index #1
Date: March 06, 2023Satisfaction of Judgment Index #6
Date: June 14, 2023Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #4
Date: March 29, 2023Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #3
Date: March 08, 2023Transcript of Judgment Index #2
Date: March 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index #6
Judge: Closed |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #5
Judge: Closed |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #4
Judge: Closed |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #3
Judge: Closed |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Transcript of Judgment Index #2
Judge: Closed |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing
Judge: Closed |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Index #1
Judge: Closed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.