Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Williams, Jeffrey J, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Seabrooks II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSeabrooks II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2023 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: February 27, 2023Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #5
Date: March 13, 2023Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #8
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #6
Date: March 13, 2023Request for Writ of Recovery Index #7
Date: March 28, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #4
Date: March 02, 2023Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #9
Date: March 29, 2023Order-Other Index #3
Date: March 01, 2023Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: March 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #9
Judge: Closed |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #8
Judge: Closed |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Recovery Index #7
Judge: Closed |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #5
Judge: Closed |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index #6
Judge: Closed |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Kralik, Nicole
Judge: Closed |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Closed |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index #4
Judge: Closed |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index #3
Judge: Closed |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Summons Index #2
Judge: Closed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.