Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Trevino, Catherine A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrevino, Catherine A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2023 |
CategoryConsumer Credit Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #21
Date: April 27, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Index #9
Date: March 03, 2023Confession of Judgment Index #19
Date: April 24, 2023Civil Cover Sheet Index #4
Date: February 21, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #20
Date: April 24, 2023Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #7
Date: February 24, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #13
Date: March 03, 2023Memorandum Index #10
Date: March 03, 2023Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Index #11
Date: March 03, 2023Affidavit of Non-Military Status Index #12
Date: March 03, 2023Complaint-Civil Index #6
Date: February 21, 2023Responsive Motion Filed By: Defendant Josephson, Mitchel D Index #16
Date: March 22, 2023Summons Index #1
Date: February 21, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment Index #8
Date: March 03, 2023Discovery Plan Index #5
Date: February 21, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #18
Date: April 14, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #17
Date: April 13, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #14
Date: March 03, 2023Certificate of Representation Index #3
Date: February 21, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: February 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney HICKS, WILLIAM C; Defendant Josephson, Mitchel D Index #22
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #21
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Confession of Judgment Index #19
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #20
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #18
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A.
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #17
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Responsive Motion Filed By: Defendant Josephson, Mitchel D Index #16
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney HICKS, WILLIAM C; Defendant Josephson, Mitchel D Index #15
Judge: Trevino, Catherine A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.