Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bowes, Carson Michael, filed a(n) Implied Consent case against Commissioner Of Public Safety, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Trevino, Catherine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrevino, Catherine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2023 |
CategoryImplied Consent |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #5
Date: March 08, 2023Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #8
Date: July 06, 2023Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #9
Date: July 07, 2023Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #6
Date: March 10, 2023Notice of Case Filing Index #4
Date: February 17, 2023Implied Consent Petition Index #1
Date: February 13, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: February 17, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: February 13, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7
Date: March 13, 2023Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #13
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #13 | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Petitioner Bowes, Carson Michael; Respondent Commissioner of Public Safety Index #12
Judge: Open |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #11
Judge: Open |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #9
Judge: Open |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #8
Judge: Open |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7
Judge: Open |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Trevino, Catherine A. Index #6
Judge: Open |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index #5
Judge: Open |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Filing Index #4
Judge: Open |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Judge: Open |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.