Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fairview Health Services, filed a(n) Default Judgment case represented by Hanson, Gregory Eric - Lead Attorney, against Morrow, Cody Michael, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryDefault Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Date: January 31, 2023Judgment Index #5
Date: February 01, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: January 31, 2023Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #3
Date: January 31, 2023Summons and Complaint Index #1
Date: January 31, 2023Writ of Execution Index #8
Date: March 09, 2023Writ of Execution Returned Index #9
Date: April 18, 2023Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #6
Date: February 01, 2023Request for Writ of Execution Index #7
Date: March 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned Index #9
Judge: Closed |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Index #8
Judge: Closed |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Execution Index #7
Judge: Closed |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index #5
Judge: Closed |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #6
Judge: Closed |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing
Judge: Closed |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Judge: Closed |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index #2
Judge: Closed |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #3
Judge: Closed |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint Index #1
Judge: Closed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.