Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fairview Health Services, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hanson, Gregory Eric - Lead Attorney, against Neville, Glen W, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Dowdal, Bridgid E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryConsumer Credit Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Civil Cover Sheet Index #1
Date: January 30, 2023Satisfaction of Judgment Index #9
Date: May 12, 2023Summons and Complaint Index #2
Date: January 30, 2023Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #8
Date: February 24, 2023Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #5
Date: February 17, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #3
Date: January 30, 2023Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #4
Date: February 13, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #6
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Filing of Order; Entry of Judg; Docketing of Judg Index #7
Date: February 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index #9
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #8
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order; Entry of Judg; Docketing of Judg Index #7
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #5
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #6
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Dowdal, Bridgid E. Index #4
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet Index #1
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint Index #2
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index #3
Judge: Dowdal, Bridgid E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.