Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Implied Consent case in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Seabrooks II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2023 |
CategoryImplied Consent |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Notice of Judicial Determination Index #12
Date: April 25, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #7
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Case Filing Index #8
Date: February 08, 2023Waiver of Time Requirement for Hearing Index #9
Date: February 08, 2023Motion Index #4
Date: February 03, 2023Order Granting Motion Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #6
Date: February 07, 2023Waiver of Time Requirement for Hearing Index #3
Date: January 29, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #2
Date: January 29, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #5
Date: February 03, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #10
Date: February 22, 2023Implied Consent Petition Index #1
Date: January 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Respondent Commissioner of Public Safety; Attorney GROSTYAN, ANTHONY MICHAEL Index #13
Judge: Open |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judicial Determination Index #12
Judge: Open |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Filed By: Attorney GROSTYAN, ANTHONY MICHAEL Index #11
Judge: Open |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #10
Judge: Open |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index #7
Judge: Open |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Filing Index #8
Judge: Open |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Time Requirement for Hearing Index #9
Judge: Open |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #6
Judge: Open |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Index #4
Judge: Open |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #5
Judge: Open |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.