Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Default Judgment case represented by Hicks, William C - Lead Attorney, against Franke, Felicia, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryDefault Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Summons and Complaint Index #1
Date: January 17, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: January 17, 2023Affidavit of No Service Index #8
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Right to Request a Hearing on Attorney's Fees Index #5
Date: January 17, 2023Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #11
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #10
Date: January 25, 2023Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees Index #4
Date: January 17, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #6
Date: January 17, 2023Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #13
Date: November 01, 2023Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #3
Date: January 17, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #7
Date: January 17, 2023Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #12
Date: February 23, 2023Judgment Index #9
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #13 | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #12
Judge: Closed |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #11
Judge: Closed |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #10
Judge: Closed |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index #9
Judge: Closed |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing
Judge: Closed |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint Index #1
Judge: Closed |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index #2
Judge: Closed |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of No Service Index #8
Judge: Closed |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Right to Request a Hearing on Attorney's Fees Index #5
Judge: Closed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.