Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions, Inc., filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Arnal, Corbin Cribbs - Lead Attorney, against Kane, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClosed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter Index #5
Date: January 14, 2023Judgment Index #6
Date: January 19, 2023Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: November 17, 2022Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: November 17, 2022Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #8
Date: March 07, 2023Summons and Notice Index #3
Date: December 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #8 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Plaintiff Credit Corp Solutions, Inc.; Defendant Kane, Joseph Index #7 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #6 | |
January 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter Index #5 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Due [R] Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Lancaster, Peter )
Judge: Lancaster, Peter |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons and Notice Index #3 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Filed By: Plaintiff Credit Corp Solutions, Inc.; Defendant Kane, Joseph Index #4 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index # 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.