Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Certificate Of Dissolution Index # 16 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Carlton County, MN, . Carlton County, MN Superior Courts with Stumme, Rebekka Lynn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStumme, Rebekka Lynn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCarlton County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeCustody Order |
Appendix A to Family Court Order
Date: February 07, 2020Six-Month Review Hearing Request Instructions
Date: February 07, 2020Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: February 07, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: February 07, 2020Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: October 25, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: October 25, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 11, 2018Notice of Deficiency
Date: August 07, 2018Order for Child Support
Date: July 11, 2018Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: March 28, 2018Certificate of Dissolution
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 02, 2018Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: February 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Appendix A to Family Court Order | |
February 07, 2020 | Hearing | Six-Month Review Hearing Request Instructions | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appendix A to Family Court Order Index # 41
Judge: Stumme, Rebekka Lynn |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Six-Month Review Hearing Request Instructions Index # 42
Judge: Stumme, Rebekka Lynn |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 39
Judge: Stumme, Rebekka Lynn |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Index # 40
Judge: Stumme, Rebekka Lynn |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Custody order (Judicial Officer: Stumme, Rebekka Lynn)
Judge: Stumme, Rebekka Lynn |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Index # 38
Judge: Stumme, Rebekka Lynn |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.