Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Carlton County, MN, . Carlton County, MN Superior Courts with Beiers, Leslie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCarlton County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDissolution Granted - Judgment |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Filing of Order
Date: March 14, 2018Certificate of Dissolution
Date: October 09, 2017Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: October 09, 2017Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: October 09, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 31, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: June 07, 2017ICMC Order for Financial Early Neutral Evaluation
Date: June 07, 2017ICMC Order for Financial Early Neutral Evaluation
Date: May 31, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 22, 2017Order-Other
Date: May 22, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: April 28, 2017Notice of Case Assignment
Date: April 28, 2017Notice of Discrepancy
Date: April 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Judge: Beiers, Leslie |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Dissolution
Judge: Beiers, Leslie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.