Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Carlton County, MN, . Carlton County, MN Superior Courts with Beiers, Leslie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeiers, Leslie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCarlton County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDissolution Granted - Judgment |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 05, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: May 25, 2016Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: May 25, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: June 16, 2015Notice of Case Assignment
Date: June 16, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Beiers, Leslie |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Responsive Motion | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.