Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Motion Hearing filed a(n) Support case in the jurisdiction of Carlton County, MN, . Carlton County, MN Superior Courts with Bangma, Jeffrey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBangma, Jeffrey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2013 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCarlton County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeSupport Order |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: November 12, 2020Order for Child Support
Date: November 10, 2020Order for Child Support
Date: August 14, 2018Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 30, 2016Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment
Date: November 18, 2014Notice-Other
Date: November 18, 2014Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 16, 2018Order for Child Support
Date: August 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 42 | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support
Judge: Ek, Clarissa L.M. |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support Index # 41 (Judicial Officer: Ek, Clarissa L.M. )
Judge: Ek, Clarissa L.M. |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 40 (Judicial Officer: Ek, Clarissa L.M. )
Judge: Ek, Clarissa L.M. |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Support order (Judicial Officer: Ek, Clarissa L.M.)
Judge: Ek, Clarissa L.M. |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Ek, Clarissa L.M. |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Child Support Order Index # 39 (Judicial Officer: Ek, Clarissa L.M. )
Judge: Ek, Clarissa L.M. |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Default-Petitioner Index # 38 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 36 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.