Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Closed Administratively filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case in the jurisdiction of Carlton County, MN, . Carlton County, MN Superior Courts with Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2005 |
CategoryEmployment |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationCarlton County, MN |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeClosed Administratively |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Closed administratively (Judicial Officer: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr.)
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
|
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
|
July 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement (Judicial Officer: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. )
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
|
July 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit-Other
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
|
July 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
|
July 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Memorandum
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
|
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
|
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Memorandum
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
|
May 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
|
March 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Representation
Judge: Macaulay, Robert E., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.