Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Carlton County, MN, . Carlton County, MN Superior Courts with Schulte, John B, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchulte, John B, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCarlton County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice - Not All Parties |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: April 10, 2018Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: February 26, 2018Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice
Date: February 21, 2018Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: February 26, 2018Notice-Other
Date: February 06, 2018Proof of Service
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 24, 2018Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: December 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Schulte, John B, |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Schulte, John B, |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice-Other | |
January 24, 2018 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.