Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Michael Printy Arthur, against Belich, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Carlton County, MN, . Carlton County, MN Superior Courts with Friedman, Fred presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2017 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCarlton County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: July 31, 2017Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: July 31, 2017Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: April 17, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: May 31, 2017Correspondence
Date: April 17, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: April 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index # 8 | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Friedman, Fred |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 7 | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Friedman, Fred )
Judge: Friedman, Fred |
|
May 31, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 5 | |
April 26, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.