Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Carlton County, MN, . Carlton County, MN Superior Courts with Friedman, Fred presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFriedman, Fred Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2016 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCarlton County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Correspondence
Date: December 13, 2016Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: December 13, 2016Notice-Other
Date: June 08, 2017Notice-Other
Date: October 13, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: October 18, 2016Notice of Case Filing
Date: September 12, 2016Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: December 13, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: September 12, 2016Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: June 07, 2017Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: September 09, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice-Other | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Index # 11 | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 10 | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Friedman, Fred |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 8 | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.