Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blue Earth County Human Services Dept., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Hinderman, Rosalie, in the jurisdiction of Blue Earth County, MN, . Blue Earth County, MN Superior Courts with Lieser, Andrea presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBlue Earth County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Non-Cash Bond Posted Index #27
Date: February 08, 2022Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Lieser, Andrea J. Index #26
Date: February 08, 2022Inventory Filed By: Name Not Available Online; Name Not Available Online Index #29
Date: March 09, 2022Correspondence Index #25
Date: February 08, 2022Copy Request Index #24
Date: January 06, 2022Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Lieser, Andrea J. Index #11
Date: December 01, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #5
Date: December 01, 2021Petition-Other Index #10
Date: December 01, 2021Petition for Guardianship Index #1
Date: December 01, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #9
Date: December 01, 2021Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Lieser, Andrea J. Index #7
Date: December 01, 2021Order-Other Judicial Officer: Walker, Bradley C. Index #19
Date: January 05, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #23
Date: January 05, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #18
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Index #21
Date: January 05, 2022Order Granting Guardianship - Conservatorship Judicial Officer: Walker, Bradley C. Index #20
Date: January 05, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #17
Date: December 17, 2021Petition for Guardianship - Conservatorship Index #12
Date: December 02, 2021Notice of Hearing Index #13
Date: December 02, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #14
Date: December 07, 2021Waiver of Counsel Index #16
Date: December 17, 2021Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #2
Date: December 01, 2021Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Lieser, Andrea J. Index #6
Date: December 01, 2021Correspondence Index #46
Date: September 25, 2023Order Allowing Annual Account Judicial Officer: Anderson, Gregory J. Index #42
Date: September 13, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Anderson, Gregory J. Index #40
Date: August 14, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #39
Date: August 14, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #41
Date: August 21, 2023Notice of Hearing Index #38
Date: August 14, 2023Non-Cash Bond Posted Index #45
Date: September 19, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #44
Date: September 14, 2023Affidavit of Service Filed By: Name Not Available Online; Name Not Available Online Index #35
Date: December 12, 2022Amended Inventory Filed By: Name Not Available Online; Name Not Available Online Index #32
Date: September 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #46 | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Non-Cash Bond Posted Index #45 | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #44 | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Allowing Annual Account Judicial Officer: Anderson, Gregory J. Index #42 | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #41 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Anderson, Gregory J. Index #40 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CAAP Audit Report Filed By: Name Not Available Online; Name Not Available Online Index #37 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #39 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index #38 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.