Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hearing filed a(n) Support case in the jurisdiction of Blue Earth County, MN, . Blue Earth County, MN Superior Courts with Solheid,Kristine , presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2016 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBlue Earth County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeSupport Order |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: March 10, 2021Order for Child Support
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: November 21, 2016Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: January 20, 2021Order for Child Support
Date: November 21, 2016Notice of Docketing of Judgment
Date: February 12, 2016Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: February 04, 2016Notice of Case Filing
Date: January 15, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: January 13, 2016Order for Child Support
Date: February 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support
Judge: Solheid, Kristine |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 52
Judge: Solheid,Kristine , |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support Index # 51 (Judicial Officer: Solheid,Kristine , )
Judge: Solheid,Kristine , |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Support order (Judicial Officer: Solheid,Kristine ,)
Judge: Solheid,Kristine , |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 50 (Judicial Officer: Solheid,Kristine , )
Judge: Solheid,Kristine , |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Solheid,Kristine , |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Solheid, Kristine |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 49
Judge: Solheid,Kristine , |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 48
Judge: Solheid,Kristine , |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.