Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eviction Hearing filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Blue Earth County, MN, . Blue Earth County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2023 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBlue Earth County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 8 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 7 | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 6 | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 5 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index # 3 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 4 | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Index # 2 | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation Index # 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.