Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mbg Property Management, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Danielson, Silas Leonard - Lead Attorney, against Barnes, Keith, in the jurisdiction of Blue Earth County, MN, . Blue Earth County, MN Superior Courts with Lieser, Andrea presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBlue Earth County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Barnes, Keith Index #13
Date: May 19, 2022Affidavit of Attorney Index #7
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #11
Date: March 31, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Lieser, Andrea J. Index #10
Date: March 31, 2022Stipulation Index #8
Date: March 30, 2022Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Lieser, Andrea J. Index #9
Date: March 30, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #6
Date: March 24, 2022Eviction Summons Index #3
Date: March 16, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4
Date: March 16, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #1
Date: March 16, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #5
Date: March 21, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #2
Date: March 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Barnes, Keith Index #13 | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index # 13 | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #11 | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Lieser, Andrea J. Index #10 | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 11 | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Index # 10 (Judicial Officer: Lieser, Andrea J. )
Judge: Lieser, Andrea J. |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction, Non-Payment of Rent - Judgment | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Index #7 | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation Index #8 | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Lieser, Andrea J. Index #9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.