Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Highland Hills Apartments, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Maxwell, Nicholas John - Lead Attorney, against Bibbins, Felisha, in the jurisdiction of Blue Earth County, MN, . Blue Earth County, MN Superior Courts with Johnson, Kurt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2016 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBlue Earth County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Court Clerk Minutes Index #7
Date: May 13, 2016Returned Mail Index #8
Date: May 24, 2016Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #4
Date: May 09, 2016Affidavit of Service Index #3
Date: May 04, 2016Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Johnson, Kurt D. Index #5
Date: May 13, 2016Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #6
Date: May 13, 2016Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: April 29, 2016Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: April 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index #8 | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index # 8 | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index #7 | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Johnson, Kurt D. Index #5 | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #6 | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index # 7 | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 6 | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Index # 5 (Judicial Officer: Johnson, Kurt D. )
Judge: Johnson, Kurt D. |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Eviction, Non-Payment of Rent - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Johnson, Kurt D.)
Judge: Johnson, Kurt D. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.