Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Blue Earth County, MN, . Blue Earth County, MN Superior Courts with Anderson, Gregory J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2021 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBlue Earth County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: January 05, 2022Certificate of Representation
Date: November 19, 2021Summons
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: November 19, 2021Statement of Claim
Date: November 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Anderson, Gregory J. |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Anderson,Gregory J. , )
Judge: Anderson,Gregory J. , |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 7 | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Anderson,Gregory J. ,)
Judge: Anderson,Gregory J. , |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
January 05, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 6 | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.