Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Blue Earth County, MN, . Blue Earth County, MN Superior Courts with Haugh, Howard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2017 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBlue Earth County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice - Judgment |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: April 27, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: April 13, 2017Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: February 22, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: February 03, 2017Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: February 01, 2017Other Document
Date: April 24, 2017Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: April 27, 2017Answer
Date: March 20, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: February 28, 2017Affidavit of Service
Date: February 09, 2017Proposed Order or Document
Date: February 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Haugh, Howard |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 16 | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 15 (Judicial Officer: Haugh,Howard , )
Judge: Haugh,Howard , |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Other Document Index # 14 | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 13 (Judicial Officer: Haugh,Howard , )
Judge: Haugh,Howard , |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Other Document Index # 12 | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Haugh, Howard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.