Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Blue Earth County, MN, . Blue Earth County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2016 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBlue Earth County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Wells, Eileen )
Judge: Wells, Eileen |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 8 | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Wells, Eileen)
Judge: Wells, Eileen |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 6 | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index # 5 | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 4 | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons Index # 1 | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Representation Index # 2 | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.