Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Change Of Name Granted filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Big Stone County, MN, . Big Stone County, MN Superior Courts with Glasrud, Charles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBig Stone County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice-Other Index # 8
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Name Change Sent to Secretary of State
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 7
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Glasrud, Charles )
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution Index # 4 (Judicial Officer: Glasrud, Charles )
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summary Real Estate Disposition Judgment Index # 5 (Judicial Officer: Glasrud, Charles )
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Change of name granted (Judicial Officer: Glasrud, Charles) Party( Schellberg, Sara M. )
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dissolution Granted - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Glasrud, Charles)
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Other Document Index # 3 (Judicial Officer: Glasrud, Charles )
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 2
Judge: Glasrud, Charles |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.