Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Findings Of Fact Conclusions Of Law And Order Index # 7 filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Big Stone County, MN, . Big Stone County, MN Superior Courts with Glasrud, Charles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2014 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBig Stone County, MN |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Docketing of Judgment
Date: August 24, 2015Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party
Date: August 24, 2015Affidavit of Service
Date: August 24, 2015Affidavit-Other
Date: August 24, 2015Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor
Date: August 24, 2015Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: August 07, 2015Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 07, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: July 06, 2015Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order
Date: August 05, 2015Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: March 21, 2018Affidavit of Increased Costs
Date: February 21, 2017Notice of Case Filing
Date: September 24, 2014Notice-Other
Date: December 19, 2014Correspondence
Date: July 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 16 | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs Index # 15 | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Docketing of Judgment | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Docketing of Judgment Index # 14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.