Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Olson Awning And Canvas Llc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Fremstad, Joel Matthew - Lead Attorney, against Riendeau, Carol, Riendeau, Garland, represented by Mccamy, Ryan Christopher - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Becker County, MN, . Becker County, MN Superior Courts with Lawson, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBecker County, MN |
|
Affidavit of Service Index #29
Date: June 08, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #25
Date: May 10, 2023Certificate of Representation Index #19
Date: February 20, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #20
Date: February 21, 2023Order Vacating Judgment Judicial Officer: Lawson, Michelle W. Index #21
Date: February 23, 2023Other Document Index #18
Date: February 20, 2023Affidavit of Defendant Index #16
Date: February 20, 2023Other Document Index #17
Date: February 20, 2023Affidavit to Vacate Conciliation Judg and Grant New Trial Index #15
Date: February 20, 2023Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Solheim, Susan J. Index #9
Date: October 12, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #8
Date: September 08, 2022Affidavit of Service Filed By: Attorney FREMSTAD, JOEL MATTHEW Index #37
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment by Attorney or Party Index #36
Date: June 15, 2023Judgment Index #34
Date: June 13, 2023Order-Other Judicial Officer: Solheim, Susan J. Index #4
Date: August 18, 2022Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Solheim, Susan J. Index #33
Date: June 12, 2023Affidavit of Service Filed By: Attorney FREMSTAD, JOEL MATTHEW Index #32
Date: June 09, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #31
Date: June 09, 2023Motion to Vacate Index #14
Date: February 20, 2023Certificate of Representation Filed By: Attorney FREMSTAD, JOEL MATTHEW Index #7
Date: August 18, 2022Notice of Deficiency Filed By: Attorney FREMSTAD, JOEL MATTHEW Index #6
Date: August 18, 2022Summons Index #2
Date: August 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Filed By: Attorney FREMSTAD, JOEL MATTHEW Index #37 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment by Attorney or Party Index #36 | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Attorney FREMSTAD, JOEL MATTHEW; Attorney MCCAMY, RYAN CHRISTOPHER Index #35 | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #34 | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Solheim, Susan J. Index #33 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation Filed By: Attorney FREMSTAD, JOEL MATTHEW; Attorney MCCAMY, RYAN CHRISTOPHER Index #30 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Filed By: Attorney FREMSTAD, JOEL MATTHEW Index #32 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #31 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #29 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Filed By: Attorney MCCAMY, RYAN CHRISTOPHER; Defendant Riendeau, Carol; Defendant Riendeau, Garland Index #28 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.