Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Essentia Health, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Christina Rae Sandy, against Johnson, Marcia, in the jurisdiction of Becker County, MN, . Becker County, MN Superior Courts with Solheim, Susan J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2021 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBecker County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order for Judgment
Date: June 09, 2021Judgment
Date: June 11, 2021Order-Other
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: April 19, 2021Summons
Date: April 19, 2021Certify Personal Service
Date: May 12, 2021Statement of Claim
Date: April 15, 2021Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index # 10 | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 9 | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 8 | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment
Judge: Solheim, Susan J. |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Solheim, Susan J. )
Judge: Solheim, Susan J. |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.