Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Range Credit Bureau Inc., filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Seth Robert Westby, against Goodrich, Scott, Goodrich, Zheni, in the jurisdiction of Becker County, MN, . Becker County, MN Superior Courts with Irvine, Peter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2017 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBecker County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment - Not All Parties |
Returned Mail
Date: January 29, 2018Judgment
Date: January 22, 2018Order for Judgment
Date: January 18, 2018Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice
Date: January 09, 2018Proof of Service
Date: December 08, 2017Returned Mail
Date: November 20, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: November 09, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: October 24, 2017Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: October 22, 2017Amended Summons and Complaint
Date: November 08, 2017Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: January 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index # 14 | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index # 13 | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 12 | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 11 | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment - not all parties | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment
Judge: Irvine, Peter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.