Pastor, Taylor,
filed a(n)
Estate Administration -
Probate
case
represented by
Brittany Carmela Thompson,
against
Avery, Katie,
in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, MI, .
Wayne County, MI
Superior Courts
with Charlene M. Elder presiding.
IN RE: ALICE TAYLOR 1998 TRUST
Case Number: CVPB21-0031216
This matter is on calendar for status of settlement. A Status Report has been filed which indicates that
additional time is needed to possibly resolve the matter. This matter is continued to Monday, October
7, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for status of settlement. No appearance is necessary on
today’s calendar.
ESTATE OF CANDACE COLLINS
Case Number: CVPB20-0030822
This matter is on calendar for further proceedings on the Motion to Vacate the Court’s Prior Order dated
June 27, 2022, and for Status of Family Court Proceedings. At the prior hearing on June 10, 2024, the
Court was informed a pending motion in another department could make an estate proceeding
unnecessary. No Status Report has been filed. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to
provide the Court with a status.
S-PR-0012771 In Re the Donald W Potter & Lucille M Potter 2007 Trust
Petition for instructions / to interpret trust terms is recommended for approval as
prayed.
GUARDIANSHIP OF STEVEY HAYWARD
Case Number: CVPG21-0031154
This matter is on calendar for confirmation of filing of the Second Account. The Second Account
has not been filed. No Status Report has been filed. This matter is continued to Monday, August
19, 2024, at 8:30 a.m. in Department 42 for further proceedings to confirm filing of the Second
Account. If the Second Account cannot be filed prior to the continued hearing date, the Guardian
is ORDERED to file a Status Report at least five days prior to the continued hearing date. The
clerk is instructed to mail a copy of today’s minute order to the Guardian. No appearance is
necessary on today’s calendar.
CONSERVATORSHIP OF BRYCE SILVA
Case Number: 24PC-0032309
This matter is on calendar for further proceedings to confirm filing of the Conservatorship Care Plan,
and Determination of Appropriate Level of Care Form. The Conservatorship Care Plan and
Determination of Appropriate Level of Care Form have not been filed. An appearance is necessary on
today’s calendar to address the required documents.
ESTATES
Jul 09, 2024 |
Roger L. Lund
|
Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report |
201900527319PRCE
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA
COUNTY OF VENTURA
Probate Notes
201900527319PRCE: In the Matter of Dianna Lynn Henderson
07/09/2024 in Department J6
Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 06/04/24
The status report was timely filed on 06/04/24. The Court has reviewed the status
report. It is complete. No appearance required.
The Court Investigator’s report was filed on 06/27/24. The Court has reviewed
the report. It is complete.
The next biennial status report and Court Investigator’s Report shall be filed by
06/04/26 and set for a hearing on 07/21/26 at 10:30 AM in Department J6.
The clerk shall give notice.
_______________________
The Court uses Zoom exclusively for remote appearances in Department J6. For information on
the Zoom procedures, and for general information regarding Judge Lund and his courtroom
rules and procedures, please visit: http://www.judgerogerlund.com.
Probate Notes:
The court investigator’s report has been received and recommends that the conservatorship continue. No appearance is required.
The next review hearing will be held on July 20, 2026, at 8:30 a.m. in the court identified above.
Appearances:
The court is open to the public for court business. The court is also conducting hearings via Zoom videoconference.
Meeting ID: 161 797 5412
Passcode: 8749009