Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Henagan, Russell Thomas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Henagan, Olimpia Carmen, in the jurisdiction of Washtenaw County, MI, . Washtenaw County, MI Superior Courts with O'Brien, Darlene A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce, No Children (Do) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashtenaw County, MI |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Of Non Conformity | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment of Divorce Sgd 9/25/19 | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer O'Brien, Darlene A.) Per MB Return Docket 2/21, Adj. 4/10, 6/5/19 Result: Held | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: O'Brien, Darlene A.) | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulated Order Sgd. 6/5/19 | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer O'Brien, Darlene A.) Per MB Return Docket 2/21, Adj. 4/10 Result: Adjourned | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer O'Brien, Darlene A.) Per MB Return Docket 2/21, Adj. 4/10 Result: Adjourned | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Pretrial and Scheduling Order Sgd 2/21/19 | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer O'Brien, Darlene A.) Per 1/20 At-Issue | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Of Non-Conformity |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.