Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kirk, Leticia Monique, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Shannon Laura Urbon, against Kirk, Harold Dewayne, in the jurisdiction of Washtenaw County, MI, . Washtenaw County, MI Superior Courts with Brown, Archie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce, Minor Children (Dm) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashtenaw County, MI |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge Reassigned per Local Administrative Order | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice Returned Undeliverable | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Of Non Confirmity | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELED Hearing for Entry of Order (12:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Brown, Archie C.) Cancel | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment of Divorce Sgd 7/17/19 | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Support Order Final - Eff. 1/1/19 - Sgd 7/17/19 | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: Brown, Archie C.) | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Brown, Archie C.) Pltf/ Motion for Entry of Default JOD Result: Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.