Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fox, Nancy Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Steven M Jentzen, against Fox, James Michael, represented by Cynthia J Evans, in the jurisdiction of Washtenaw County, MI, . Washtenaw County, MI Superior Courts with O'Brien, Darlene A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce, No Children (Do) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashtenaw County, MI |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Entire File | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference-Domestic (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Judge, Historical) EXTENSION_COUNT: 0000 Result: DISMISSED BEFORE TRIAL | |
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Order for dismissal filed Comment: Dismissal fd (sgd 03/27/2013) (mf 04/02/13 pg 29754) | |
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Final-other disposition Comment: Final-other disposition | |
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Final - Other Disposition | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Referral to FOC Comment: Order and referral to friend of the court/proof of service fd (sgd 02/22/2013) | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Pretrial and scheduling order filed Comment: Pretrial and scheduling order/proof of service fd (sgd 02/22/2013) | |
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Domestic Pretrial (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Judge, Historical) EXTENSION_COUNT: 0000 Result: NOT HELD NO ONE SHOWED | |
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Pretrial held Comment: Domestic pretrial not held/no one appeared/sc 7/18/13 @ 2:00 p.m./property and alimony referred to foc for referee hearing | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Event notice generated Comment: Event notice generated, jentzen, steven m , #03519662 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.