Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sullivan, Dion Christopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Robert J Killewald, against Peet, Melissa Rae, in the jurisdiction of Washtenaw County, MI, . Washtenaw County, MI Superior Courts with O'Brien, Darlene A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce, No Children (Do) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashtenaw County, MI |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Entire File | |
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Copy of Record of Divorce or Annulment Comment: Copy of record of divorce or annulment fd Amount: 0.00 | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Final-judgment Comment: Final-judgment | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Consent judgment of divorce filed Comment: Consent judgment of divorce fd (sgd 05/17/2012) (mf 05/24/12 pg 00049-55) | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Judge, Historical) EXTENSION_COUNT: 0001 Directive: PLTF/ CONSENT JOD Result: JUDGMENT | |
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Testimony taken/judgment granted & signed Comment: Pltf sworn/proofs put on record/jod granted and signed (cc10/connors/digital/dcoleman/ceo 7197) | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing/proof of service filed Comment: Notice of hearing & proof of service/cert of serv fd | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Default app & non military affidavit/entry filed Comment: Default app & non military affidavit/entry/cert of mailing fd | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons served filed (ack ) Comment: Summons served fd (ack ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.